Khan, Farhana Ali (CPSO#: 99143)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Illinois, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 19 Jul 2014
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017