Khan, Imtiaz Mustaq Samad (CPSO#: 64053)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 403
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 828-6464
Fax: (905) 828-8778
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Imtiaz M.S. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Khan ( CPSO# 64053 )

Business Address:
Suite 403
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 828-6464

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 23 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IMTIAZ MUSTAQ SAMAD KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1992