Khan, Naeem Asif Hussain (CPSO#: 33637)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1966

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Osmania University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
127 Westmore Drive
Toronto ON  M9V 3Y6
Phone: (416) 749-3933
Fax: (416) 749-3936
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAEEM ASIF HUSSAIN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1982