Khan, Noman Abdulhameed A (CPSO#: 102708)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 10 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dow Medical College, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 11 Mar 2014 to 05 May 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 06 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 Mar 2016
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Mar 2016