Khan, Rabia Naseer (CPSO#: 68184)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: Singh, Rabia Naseer (used until: 28 Jun 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
175 Alma Street
Rockwood ON  N0B 2K0
Phone: (519) 856-4681
Fax: (519) 856-4612
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RABIA NASEER KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996