Khan, Rajal Yusuf (CPSO#: 88152)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2008 to 04 Apr 2008
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Mar 2009 to 05 Apr 2009
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 31 Aug 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2009