Khan, Rubeena (CPSO#: 87766)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Lucknow, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit B6
2537 Hamilton Regional Road 56
Hamilton ON  L0R 1C0
Phone: (905) 692-2580
Fax: (905) 692-0258
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

675 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 768-4400
Fax: (905) 575-0760
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

C107-3885 Duke Of York Blvd
Mississauga ON  L5B 0E4
Canada
Phone: (905) 366-4441
Fax: (905) 366-4443
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rubeena Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Khan ( CPSO# 87766 )

Business Address:
Unit B6
2537 Hamilton Regional Road 56
Hamilton ON  L0R 1C0
Phone Number: (905) 692-2580

Business Address:
2540 Postmaster Drive
Oakville ON  L6M 0N2

Business Address:
3885 Duke of York Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5B 0E4

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUBEENA KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2007 to 18 Dec 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 19 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2016