Khan, Saadia Naseer (CPSO#: 67968)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Urdu

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 16
2555 Erin Centre Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5M 5H1
Phone: (905) 828-0270
Fax: (905) 828-0277
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khan ( CPSO# 67968 )

Business Address:
2555 Erin Centre Boulevard
Unit 16
Mississauga ON  L5M 5H1
Phone Number: (905) 828-0030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAADIA NASEER KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1996