Khan, Sandra Marie (CPSO#: 63993)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Medical Center
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone: (705) 876-4540
Fax: (705) 743-3865
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Graham K. Gibb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khan ( CPSO# 63993 )
Dr. G. Gibb ( CPSO# 74531 )

Business Address:
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 740-6890

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA MARIE KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1992