Khan, Seema Ann (CPSO#: 84672)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bridgepoint Hospital
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone: (416) 461-8252
Fax: (416) 461-2089
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Anishnawbe Health Toronto
179 Gerrard St E
Toronto ON  M5A 2E5
Canada
Phone: (416) 920-2605
Fax: (416) 920-8876
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. A. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khan ( CPSO# 84672 )

Business Address:
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone Number: (416) 461-8252

Business Address:
179 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 2E5
Phone Number: (416) 920-2605

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 05 Nov 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEEMA ANN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 04 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 05 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 05 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 06 Nov 2011 to 05 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2012