Khan, Seema Natasha (CPSO#: 87392)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Nov 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Nov 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Urdu

Education:The Medical College of Wisconsin, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 18
1910 St Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone: (613) 523-5550
Fax: (613) 523-5580
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Seema Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khan ( CPSO# 87392 )

Business Address:
Caremedics Elmvale Acres
Unit 18
1910 St. Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 523-5550

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jul 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 06 Jul 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 May 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Jun 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jun 2010 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Seema  Natasha  Khan may practise medicine independently in internal
                  medicine and clinical immunology and allergy, only.