Khan, Shawn Jehan (CPSO#: 80539)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 2009