Khan, Wasim Mohammad (CPSO#: 63548)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 16 May 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 May 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1992
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 16 May 2003

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 07 Apr 2003
Summary:

 On April 7, 2003 the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Khan had committed acts of professional 
 misconduct with respect to professional misconduct in that the governing body of a health 
 profession in another jurisdiction other than Ontario found that the member committed an act of 
 professional misconduct that would, in the opinion of the panel, be an act of professional 
 misconduct as defined by the regulations.

On May 16, 2003, the Discipline Committee ordered that 
 Dr. Khan be reprimanded with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.  In 
 addition, the Committee ordered Dr. Khan(s certificate of registration be revoked.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 07, 2003