Khan, Yasmin (CPSO#: 77552)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
R Fraser Elliott Building GS 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

480 University Ave, Suite 300
Toronto ON  M5G 1V2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yasmin Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Khan ( CPSO# 77552 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
R Fraser Elliot Building
GS480 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASMIN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007