Khan, Yasser Anwar (CPSO#: 71133)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Apr 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Apr 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2A
800 Southdown Road
Mississauga ON  L5J 2Y4
Phone: (905) 822-2020
Fax: (905) 822-3030
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

284 Queen Street East
Suite 236
Brampton ON  L6V2C2
Canada
Phone: 905-822-2020
Fax: 905-822-3030
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yasser A. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Khan ( CPSO# 71133 )

Business Address:
2A - 800 Southdown Road
Mississauga ON  L5J 2Y4
Phone Number: (905) 822-2020

Business Address:
Suite 236
284 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1C2
Phone Number: (905) 460-0220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASSER ANWAR KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2003