Khan, Zanobia Fayyaz (CPSO#: 93339)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
200 Elizabeth Street
11th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 5619
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zanobia Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Khan ( CPSO# 93339 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
200 Elizabeth Street
11th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5319

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZANOBIA FAYYAZ KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2016