Khan, Zehanat Ali (CPSO#: 42482)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 2010