Khanapure, Kiran Shankarappa (CPSO#: 98718)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Bangalore University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Mar 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Mar 2014