Khanna, Julie Jasmina (CPSO#: 62211)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Inst of Cosmetic & Laser Surgery
Suite 100
1344 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 7W5
Phone: (905) 842-2262
Fax: (905) 842-3625
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 31 Aug 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE JASMINA KHANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHANNA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1991