Khanna, Maneesh (CPSO#: 99001)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ranchi University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 25 Aug 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013