Khanna, Nitin Verinder (CPSO#: 72618)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Gastroenterology
St Joseph's Health Care Center
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6125
Fax: (519) 646-6130
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N.V. Khanna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Khanna ( CPSO# 72618 )

Business Address:
Division of Gastroenterology
St. Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvernor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6125

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Oct 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NITIN VERINDER KHANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHANNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2002