Khanna, Rajiv (CPSO#: 59468)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 111
170 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A8
Phone: (905) 566-0121
Fax: (905) 566-8100
Electoral District: 05

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJIV KHANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHANNA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1989