Khanna, Ranbir Singh (CPSO#: 18767)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 20 Sep 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Bombay, 1949

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1963
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Sep 1990