Khanna, Reena (CPSO#: 84246)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre/
St. Joseph's Health Care
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 34945
Fax: 519-663-3700
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Reena Khanna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Khanna ( CPSO# 84246 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
St. Joseph's Health Care
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REENA KHANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHANNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2011