Khanna, Vickas (CPSO#: 86468)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Room G845
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33588
Fax: 905 540 6599
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vickas Khanna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Khanna ( CPSO# 86468 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Healthcare
Charlton Campus
50 Charlton Avenue East
Suite G845
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICKAS KHANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHANNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012