Kharal, Aysha (CPSO#: 92176)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Islamic International Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Medicenters
611 Wonderland Road North
London ON  N6H 4V6
Phone: (519) 471-6686
Fax: (519) 471-2801
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kharal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kharal ( CPSO# 92176 )

Business Address:
London Medicenters
611 Wonderland Road North
London ON  N6H 4V6
Phone Number: (519) 471-6686

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Pakistan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Feb 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AYSHA KHARAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHARAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Oct 2009 to 12 Jan 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jan 2010 to 20 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 07 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2012