Khare, Suneeta Dhananjay (CPSO#: 66767)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S.D. Khare Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khare ( CPSO# 66767 )

Business Address:
Quinte Healthcare Corporation
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNEETA DHANANJAY KHARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHARE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998