Kharrat, Ashraf (CPSO#: 97780)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Toronto, Ontario
Div of Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-813-1500
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHRAF KHARRAT shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KHARRAT is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. KHARRAT shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KHARRAT is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. KHARRAT shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KHARRAT is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KHARRAT no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018