Khatchatourian, Marina (CPSO#: 63937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English, Persian

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Toronto GI Clinic
Suite 450
5 Fairview Mall Drive
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 322-7517
Fax: (416) 489-8053
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marina Khatchatourian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khatchatourian ( CPSO# 63937 )

Business Address:
Suite 450
5 Fairview Mall Drive
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone Number: (416) 322-7517

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 01 Oct 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARINA KHATCHATOURIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHATCHATOURIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1992