Khateeb, Mashael Omar M (CPSO#: 105380)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2015 to 11 Mar 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Mar 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2016