Khatoon, Salma (CPSO#: 91442)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sind, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 08 Feb 2011 to 02 May 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 03 May 2011 to 02 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 03 May 2012 to 02 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 03 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Oct 2013