Khatri, Prateek (CPSO#: 92776)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Division of General Internal Med.
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Prateek Khatri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Khatri ( CPSO# 92776 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Division of General Internal Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRATEEK KHATRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHATRI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014