Khazzam, Charles (CPSO#: 57947)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Mar 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West End Family Care Clinic
80 Michael Cowpland Road
Kanata ON  K2M 1P6
Phone: (613) 599-3321
Fax: 6135993366
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Berlie Khazzam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Khazzam ( CPSO# 57947 )
Dr. M. Berlie ( CPSO# 65007 )

Business Address:
43 Northgate Street
Ottawa ON  K2G 6C8

Business Address:
80 Michael Cowpland Road
Kanata ON  K2M 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 599-3321

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES KHAZZAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAZZAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 1997