Khera, Joginder Singh (CPSO#: 52352)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Welsh National School of Medicine, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1423 Upper Ottawa Street
Unit 10
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone: (905) 575-0228
Fax: (905) 575-0311
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joginder Khera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Khera ( CPSO# 52352 )

Business Address:
10 - 1423 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 575-0228

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOGINDER SINGH KHERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHERA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985