Kherani, Raheem Badur (CPSO#: 75030)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 07 Feb 2005 to 28 Feb 2005
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2005