Khetan, Vikas (CPSO#: 82313)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Mysore University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2005 to 27 May 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 28 May 2005 to 31 Mar 2006
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2006