Khetani, Justin Dilip (CPSO#: 86787)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Nov 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
1435 Plains Road East
Burlington ON  L7R 3P9
Phone: (905) 639-2244
Fax: (905) 639-2253
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Justin Khetani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Khetani ( CPSO# 86787 )

Business Address:
5 - 1435 Plains Road East
Burlington ON  L7R 3P9
Phone Number: (905) 639-2244

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUSTIN DILIP KHETANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHETANI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2012