Khithani, Anil Kanayalal (CPSO#: 65001)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Sindhi

Education:University of Bombay, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3430 Finch Avenue East
Suite 206
Scarborough ON  M1W 2R5
Phone: (416) 497-3303
Fax: (416) 497-5458
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anil K. Khithani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khithani ( CPSO# 65001 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
3430 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1W 2R5
Phone Number: (416) 497-3303

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANIL KANAYALAL KHITHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHITHANI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993