Khodawandi, Kurosch Alexander (CPSO#: 63641)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 307
672 Brant Street
Burlington ON  L7R 2H3
Phone: (905) 632-5138
Fax: (905) 632-9961
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kurosch A. Khodawandi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Khodawandi ( CPSO# 63641 )

Business Address:
307 - 672 Brant Street
Burlington ON  L7R 2H3
Phone Number: (905) 632-5138

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KUROSCH ALEXANDER KHODAWANDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHODAWANDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992