Khoddami, Maliheh (CPSO#: 67079)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Shiraz University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Mar 1994
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jun 1997