Khoja, Murtuza Hyder (CPSO#: 85839)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University College of Dublin, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dusk Medical Centre
55 Dusk Drive
Unit 1
Brampton ON  L6Y 5Z6
Phone: (905) 451-9999
Fax: (905) 456-8998
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

25 Woodbine Downs Blvd
Unit 10
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 907-536
Fax: (905) 741-2273
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4000 Highway 7
Unit 2
Vaughan ON  L4L 8Z2
Canada
Phone: (905) 851-5769
Fax: (905) 851-0682
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

500 Copper Creek Blvd
Markham ON  L6B 0S1
Canada
Phone: (905) 205-1400
Fax: (905) 205-1402
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Unit 8
51 Mountainash road
Brampton ON  L6R 1W4
Canada
Phone: (905) 799-272
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Murtuza H. Khoja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khoja ( CPSO# 85839 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke Urgent Care Clinic
25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Unit 10
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6N5
Phone Number: (416) 741-2273

Business Address:
4000 Highway 7
Unit 2
Vaughan ON  L4L 8Z2
Phone Number: (905) 851-3777

Business Address:
51 Mountainash Road
Unit 8
Brampton ON  L6R 1W4
Phone Number: (905) 799-2722

Business Address:
3530 Derry Road East
Suite 110-111
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3
Phone Number: (905) 672-0479

Business Address:
Unit 1
55 Dusk Drive
Brampton ON  L6Y 5Z6
Phone Number: (905) 451-9999

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MURTUZA HYDER KHOJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2007 to 02 Feb 2007
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2007