Khokhar, Jaswant Singh (CPSO#: 69706)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Dec 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Punjabi University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Dec 1997