Khong, Binh Kim (CPSO#: 68909)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44890
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Binh Khong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Khong ( CPSO# 68909 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BINH KIM KHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2001