Khorasani, Kasra (CPSO#: 60737)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
67 Wells Hill Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 3A7
Phone: (416) 627-4590
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

TS Medical Centre
692 Euclid Ave
Toronto ON  M2G 2T9
Canada
Phone: (416) 901-9020
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kasra Khorasani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Khorasani ( CPSO# 60737 )

Business Address:
67 Wells Hill Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 627-4590

Business Address:
TS Medical Centre
33 - 692 Euclid Avenue
Toronto ON  M2G 2T9
Phone Number: (416) 901-9020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KASRA KHORASANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHORASANI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1990