Khorasani-Zadeh, Arman (CPSO#: 111482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khorasani-Zadeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bal ( CPSO# 96117 )
Dr. A. Khorasani-Zadeh ( CPSO# 111482)

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 27 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARMAN KHORASANI-ZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHORASANI-ZADEH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2017