Khoshbakht, Noushin (CPSO#: 85252)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 218
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Phone: (905) 764-0002
Fax: (905) 764-0010
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Khoshbakht Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Khoshbakht ( CPSO# 85252 )

Business Address:
Unit 218
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Phone Number: (905) 764-0002

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NOUSHIN KHOSHBAKHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOSHBAKHT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 30 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2013