Khoshbin, Amir (CPSO#: 91258)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 May 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Orthopedic Associates
Suite 800
55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone: 416-864-5265
Fax: 4163591601
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amir Khoshbin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khoshbin ( CPSO# 91258 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Orthopedic Associates
Suite 800
55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 864-6005

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIR KHOSHBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOSHBIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2017