Khostanteen-Linhartova, Irena (CPSO#: 53772)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:University of Palacky, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Al karamah street
skmc
abu dhabi
uae
abu dhabi N/A
United Arab Emirates
Phone: 02819 0000 Ext. 3414

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Arab Emirates

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 03 Dec 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRENA KHOSTANTEEN-LINHARTOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOSTANTEEN-LINHARTOVA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1990