Khoury, Antoine Elie Antoine (CPSO#: 50964)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Sick Children's Hospital, 555 University Avenue, Toronto, ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 19 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 28 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 2015