Khoury, Haytham (CPSO#: 78849)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Aleppo, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Feb 2003 to 02 May 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 03 May 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008